Name | Fatmir Molabecirovic |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1988-01-06 (36) |
Country | |
Position | Midfielder |
2009-07-01 - 2011-12-31 | FK Otrant Ulcinj | Player |
2012-01-01 - 2012-12-31 | FK Bokelj | Player |
2014-01-01 - 2015-06-30 | FK Ibar | Player |
2016-07-01 - 2018-06-30 | FK Otrant Ulcinj | Player |
2018-07-01 - 2018-12-31 | FK Mornar Bar | Player |
2019-01-01 - Present | FK Otrant Ulcinj | Player |