Name | Bilolkhon Toshmirzaev |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1997-08-08 (27) |
Country |
2016-07-01 - 2016-12-31 | FK Pakhtakor Tashkent U23 | Player |
2017-07-01 - 2017-12-31 | Navbahor Namangan | Player |
2019-01-01 - 2020-08-31 | Oktepa Tashkent | Player |
2020-09-01 - 2023-12-31 | FK Turan | Player |
2023-07-11 - 2023-12-30 | Neftchi Fergana | Player |