Name | Denis Muslimovich Daliev |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1996-01-11 (28) |
Country | |
Position | Midfielder |
Height | 174 cm |
Preferred foot | Right |
2016-08-04 - 2017-06-30 | FK Legion Dynamo | Player |
2017-07-01 - 2019-07-14 | Angusht Nazran | Player |
2019-07-01 - 2021-01-24 | FK Inter Cherkessk | Player |
2021-02-24 - 2022-07-13 | Dinamo Stavropol | Player |
2022-07-14 - 2024-03-15 | Torpedo Vladimir | Player |
2024-08-03 - Present | Spartak Nalchik | Player |