Name | Khaled El-Khabbash |
---|---|
Country |
2017-05-24 - 2017-07-02 | Comanche | Player |
2017-08-21 - 2017-09-21 | WG.Unity | Player |
2018-07-01 - 2018-08-01 | Team Panda | Player |
2019-02-01 - 2019-04-30 | Aachen City Esports | Player |
2019-06-05 - 2020-05-31 | PRIES | Player |
2021-06-01 - Present | Trident Clan | Player |