Name | Dauren Tokmagambetov |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1997-11-07 (26) |
Country | |
Position | Guard |
2017-01-01 - 2017-12-31 | Kairat Almaty | Player |
2018-01-01 - 2018-12-31 | Kairat-Zhastar Almaty | Player |
2019-01-01 - 2019-12-31 | Kairat-Zhastar Almaty | Player |
2019-01-01 - 2019-12-31 | FK Baykonur Kyzylorda | Player |
2020-01-01 - 2021-12-31 | Turan | Player |
2022-01-01 - 2024-03-14 | Khan Tengri FC | Player |
2024-03-15 - Present | Yassy Turkistan | Player |