Name | Semir Bukvic |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1991-05-21 (33) |
Country | |
Position | Guard |
Height | 188 cm |
Preferred foot | Right |
Present | Bosnia-Herzegovina U21 | Player |
2010-01-01 - 2011-06-30 | FK Olimpik Sarajevo | Player |
2011-07-01 - 2013-07-22 | Zeljeznicar | Player |
2013-07-23 - 2013-12-31 | NK Travnik | Player |
2014-08-01 - 2017-07-11 | NK Celik Zenica | Player |
2017-07-12 - 2021-07-08 | Mladost Doboj Kakanj | Player |
2021-07-08 - 2023-07-17 | Sloboda Tuzla | Player |
2023-07-18 - Present | Araz FK | Player |