Name | Audrius Liksa |
---|---|
Date of birth | 2001-10-27 (22) |
Country | |
Position | Guard |
Present | FK Trakai II | Player |
2017-01-01 - 2018-12-31 | FK Vilniaus Vytis | Player |
2019-01-01 - 2019-07-31 | FK Riteriai II | Player |
2019-08-01 - 2020-09-30 | BFA Vilnius | Player |
2021-01-01 - Present | Panerys Vilnius | Player |