Name | Sergey Slobodianiuk |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1996-10-10 (27) |
Country |
2017-05-22 - 2017-09-30 | Hala Ares | Player |
2017-11-09 - 2017-12-31 | Double Dimension | Player |
2018-06-11 - 2018-08-31 | Mega Lada E-sports | Player |
2019-04-15 - 2019-09-27 | Aachen City Esports | Player |
2019-05-01 - 2019-06-30 | Aachen City Esports | Player |
2019-10-04 - 2019-12-31 | timurdota2 | Player |
2020-02-04 - 2020-06-13 | Team Empire Hope | Player |
2020-06-14 - 2021-04-04 | Team Empire Faith | Player |
2023-11-01 - 2023-12-18 | Team Team | Player |
2023-11-30 - Present | Monte | Player |