Name | Georgi Plamenov Radev |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1994-09-15 (30) |
Country | |
Position | Defender |
2018-06-30 | Tsarsko Selo 2015 | Player |
2010-09-26 - 2010-10-03 | Bulgaria U17 | Player |
2012-01-01 - 2013-06-30 | Cherno More Varna | Player |
2012-11-01 - 2013-04-23 | Bulgaria U19 | Player |
2013-07-01 - 2014-01-01 | PFC Dobrudzha Dobrich | On loan |
2014-01-13 - 2015-06-30 | Ljubimec | On loan |
2015-07-01 - 2016-12-31 | FK Sozopol | Player |
2016-07-01 - 2016-06-30 | Cherno More Varna | Player |
2018-07-01 - 2018-12-31 | PFC Dobrudzha Dobrich | Player |
2019-06-14 - 2019-12-31 | Spartak Varna | Player |
2020-09-04 - 2022-06-30 | FK Sozopol | Player |
2022-07-01 - 2023-06-30 | FC Lovech | Player |
2023-07-01 - Present | Chernomorets | Player |