Name | Komron Tursunov |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1996-04-21 (28) |
Country | |
Position | Forward |
Present | Tajikistan | Player |
2018-01-01 - 2019-12-31 | FK Istiqlol Dushanbe | Player |
2019-12-21 - 2020-10-15 | Mohun Bagan | Player |
2020-10-16 - 2021-08-02 | Trau FC | Player |
2021-12-06 - 2022-01-28 | Rajasthan United | Player |
2022-01-29 - 2022-08-03 | Churchill Brothers SC | Player |
2022-08-04 - 2023-08-20 | Trau FC | Player |
2023-08-21 - 2024-05-30 | Gokulam Kerala FC | Player |