Name | Gianmarco Conti |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1992-02-01 (32) |
Country | |
Position | Midfielder |
Height | 185 cm |
Weight | 75 kg |
2010-07-01 - 2013-06-30 | AC Milan | Player |
2010-08-01 - 2011-06-30 | Fano | On loan |
2011-07-01 - 2012-06-30 | Lecco | On loan |
2012-07-01 - 2013-06-30 | Bassano | On loan |
2013-07-01 - 2014-06-30 | Virtus Verona | Player |
2014-07-01 - 2015-02-01 | Pordenone | Player |
2015-02-02 - 2015-06-30 | Monza | Player |
2015-07-01 - 2016-06-30 | US Pergolettese | Player |
2016-07-23 - 2017-06-30 | Gzira United | Player |
2019-01-14 - 2020-06-30 | Gzira United | Player |
2020-12-01 - 2021-06-30 | Campodarsego | Player |
2021-08-15 - 2022-06-30 | Santa Lucia FC | Player |