Name | Ben Hamed Kone |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1987-11-02 (36) |
Country | |
Position | Forward |
Height | 168 cm |
Weight | 75 kg |
Preferred foot | Right |
2005-01-01 - 2008-12-31 | Chonburi | Player |
2007-01-01 - 2007-11-30 | Lion City Sailors FC | On loan |
2008-01-01 - 2008-11-30 | Gainare Tottori | On loan |
2009-01-01 - 2011-12-31 | Gainare Tottori | Player |
2012-07-01 - 2012-12-31 | Slavia Sofia | Player |
2014-01-01 - 2015-06-30 | FC Academica Clinceni | Player |
2015-07-01 - 2016-07-11 | FC Voluntari | Player |
2016-07-12 - 2017-06-30 | Dibba Al Fujairah | Player |
2018-01-30 - 2018-06-30 | KF Feronikeli | Player |
2018-07-01 - 2018-12-31 | Neuchatel Xamax | Player |
2019-07-01 - 2021-01-02 | Gzira United | Player |
2021-01-03 - 2021-09-09 | Sirens | Player |