Name | Andre Krul |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1987-05-08 (37) |
Country | |
Position | Guard |
Height | 185 cm |
Weight | 75 kg |
Preferred foot | Right |
2008-07-01 - 2012-06-30 | FC Utrecht | Player |
2009-07-01 - 2009-12-31 | Telstar | On loan |
2010-08-01 - 2011-06-30 | Sparta Rotterdam | On loan |
2012-07-01 - 2012-07-31 | Valletta | Player |
2012-08-01 - 2014-03-06 | Boyaca Chico | Player |
2014-03-07 - 2014-06-30 | FC Groningen | Player |
2014-07-01 - 2015-01-28 | Bayamon | Player |
2015-08-15 - 2016-06-30 | Cambuur Leeuwarden | Player |
2017-01-28 - 2017-12-31 | Spakenburg | Player |
2018-01-01 - 2018-08-09 | Preston Lions | Player |
2018-08-10 - 2019-06-30 | Ajax Reserves | Player |
2019-09-09 - 2020-01-31 | Alemannia Aachen | Player |
2020-09-10 - 2021-06-30 | AZ Reserves | Player |
2020-09-10 - 2021-06-30 | AZ | Player |