Name | Ersin Sertbas |
---|---|
Country |
2018-12-24 - 2019-08-01 | Istanbul Wildcats | Player |
2020-01-01 - 2020-03-10 | Team AURORA | Player |
2020-05-01 - 2021-04-30 | Fenerbahce | Player |
2021-05-01 - 2023-05-27 | Besiktas | Player |
2022-06-01 - Present | Besiktas.A | Player |