Name | Aleksandar Igeski |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1992-05-12 (32) |
Country | |
Position | Guard |
Height | 189 cm |
Preferred foot | Right |
2011-07-01 - 2012-06-30 | 11 Oktomvri | Player |
2012-07-01 - 2015-06-30 | Metalurg Skopje | Player |
2012-08-24 - 2013-06-30 | Lokomotiva Skopje | On loan |
2016-01-01 - 2016-09-30 | Horizont Turnovo | Player |
2017-07-01 - 2017-12-31 | FK Gostivar | Player |
2018-01-01 - 2018-06-30 | Osogovo Kocani | Player |
2018-07-01 - 2021-08-10 | Tikves Kavadarci | Player |
2020-08-10 - Present | Vardar Skopje | Player |