Name | Bahruz Teymurov |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1994-01-01 (30) |
Country | |
Position | Defender |
Present | FK Karvan | Player |
Present | Shamakhi FK II | On loan |
Present | Zaqatala | Player |
2011-07-01 - 2014-06-30 | FK Karvan | Player |
2014-07-01 - 2015-06-30 | Khazar Baku | Player |
2015-07-01 - 2016-12-31 | Shamkir | Player |
2017-01-01 - 2018-06-30 | Moik Baku | Player |
2018-07-01 - 2019-10-28 | Qaradag Lokbatan | Player |
2018-07-01 - 2019-06-30 | Qaradag Lokbatan | Player |
2020-07-01 - 2021-07-07 | PFK Simurq | Player |
2021-07-08 - 2022-06-30 | FK Kapaz | Player |
2022-07-01 - 2023-01-14 | Shamakhi FK | On loan |
2023-01-15 - Present | Zaqatala | Player |