Name | Levente Bosz |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1994-05-06 (30) |
Country | |
Position | Guard |
Height | 189 cm |
Preferred foot | Right |
2011-07-01 - 2014-08-12 | Ujpest II | Player |
2014-08-30 - 2016-01-13 | Diosgyori VTK | Player |
2016-11-15 - 2017-06-30 | BSV Schwarz-Weiss Rehden | Player |
2018-07-28 - 2020-09-13 | Vasas SC | Player |
2020-09-14 - 2021-06-30 | CSM Politehnica Iasi | Player |
2021-07-01 - 2022-06-30 | Mezokovesd Zsory | Player |