Name | Marcin Biernat |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1992-05-28 (32) |
Country | |
Position | Defender |
Height | 190 cm |
Weight | 78 kg |
Preferred foot | Right |
2010-07-01 - 2013-06-30 | Cracovia Krakow | Player |
2012-01-01 - 2012-06-30 | Ruch Radzionkow | On loan |
2012-08-17 - 2013-06-30 | Puszcza Niepolomice | On loan |
2013-07-01 - 2015-06-30 | Puszcza Niepolomice | Player |
2015-07-01 - 2017-06-30 | Chojniczanka Chojnice | Player |
2017-07-01 - 2020-08-23 | GKS Tychy 71 | Player |
2020-08-24 - 2021-07-25 | Miedz Legnica | Player |
2021-07-26 - 2022-06-30 | Gornik Polkowice | Player |
2022-07-01 - 2023-07-17 | Gornik Leczna | Player |
2023-07-18 - 2024-06-30 | Wisla Plock | Player |
2024-07-01 - Present | Podbeskidzie Bielsko Biala | Player |