Name | Samir Isanovic |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1995-07-23 (29) |
Country | |
Position | Forward |
Preferred foot | Right |
2013-01-01 - 2016-06-30 | NK Zvijezda Gradacac | Player |
2016-07-01 - 2017-01-22 | HNK Orasje | Player |
2017-01-23 - 2017-06-30 | FK Tuzla City | Player |
2021-07-13 - Present | Narpes Kraft | Player |