Name | Dejan Velevski |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1993-10-22 (30) |
Country | |
Position | Defender |
Height | 185 cm |
Preferred foot | Right |
2013-07-01 - 2014-06-30 | 11 Oktomvri | Player |
2014-06-30 - 2014-12-31 | Pelister Bitola | Player |
2015-01-01 - 2015-12-31 | Ml. Carev | Player |
2016-07-01 - 2017-06-30 | FK Vardar Negotino | Player |
2017-07-01 - 2018-02-16 | FK Sileks | Player |
2018-01-01 - 2018-06-30 | Osogovo Kocani | Player |
2018-07-24 - 2019-01-31 | FK Gostivar | Player |
2019-02-01 - 2019-06-30 | Pelister Bitola | Player |
2019-07-01 - 2021-01-01 | Ohrid | Player |