Name | Elnur Mustafazade |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1995-09-04 (29) |
Country | |
Position | Midfielder |
2014-11-18 | Azerbaijan U19 | Player |
Present | Araz Saatli | Player |
2015-07-01 - 2015-12-31 | Neftchala | Player |
2016-07-01 - 2017-06-30 | FC Agsu | Player |
2017-07-01 - 2017-12-31 | FC Agsu | Player |
2023-07-01 - 2023-12-31 | FK Karvan | Player |