Name | Alban Shillova |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1992-08-13 (32) |
Country | |
Position | Forward |
2019-06-13 | Flamurtari | Player |
2014-01-31 - 2014-06-30 | Bylis Ballsh | Player |
2019-06-14 - 2021-06-30 | KF Prishtina | Player |
2020-02-01 - 2020-08-01 | KF Drenica Skenderaj | Player |
2021-07-01 - Present | KF Llapi | Player |