Name | Smirnov Artem Alexandrovich |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1989-01-06 (35) |
Country | |
Position | Guard |
Height | 185 cm |
Weight | 80 kg |
Preferred foot | Right |
2010-01-01 - 2013-06-30 | Shinnik Yaroslavl | Player |
2013-07-01 - 2015-08-03 | FK Tosno | Player |
2014-08-28 - 2014-12-31 | PFC Sochi | On loan |
2015-08-04 - 2017-06-30 | FK Tyumen | Player |
2017-07-01 - 2018-06-30 | Baltika Kaliningrad | Player |
2018-07-01 - 2020-02-15 | FC Murom | Player |
2020-02-16 - 2021-01-24 | Chita | Player |
2022-02-21 - 2023-12-31 | Torpedo Vladimir | Player |