Name | Hristijan Kirovski |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1985-10-12 (38) |
Country | |
Position | Forward |
Height | 189 cm |
Weight | 80 kg |
Preferred foot | Right |
2001-07-01 - 2002-06-30 | Vardar Skopje | Player |
2002-07-01 - 2005-12-31 | OFK Beograd | Player |
2006-08-01 - 2006-12-31 | Ethnikos Achnas | Player |
2007-01-01 - 2007-01-31 | Luch-Energiya Vladivostok | Player |
2007-02-01 - 2007-06-30 | Vardar Skopje | Player |
2007-07-01 - 2007-12-31 | Karpaty Lviv | Player |
2008-07-01 - 2009-01-31 | Rabotnicki Skopje | Player |
2010-03-01 - 2010-06-30 | Vardar Skopje | Player |
2010-07-01 - 2011-06-30 | FK Skopje | Player |
2011-07-01 - 2012-06-30 | Apollon Limassol | Player |
2012-07-01 - 2012-12-31 | Ironi Ramat Hasharon | Player |
2013-01-01 - 2013-06-30 | Iraklis | Player |
2013-07-01 - 2014-01-01 | CSKA Sofia | Player |
2014-01-15 - 2014-07-28 | GKS Belchatow | Player |
2014-07-29 - 2015-12-31 | Shkendija Tetovo | Player |
2017-01-01 - 2018-01-29 | Chiangmai | Player |
2018-01-30 - 2018-06-30 | Rabotnicki Skopje | Player |
2018-07-01 - 2019-06-30 | Makedonija Gj. P | Player |
2019-07-01 - 2020-06-30 | FC Struga Trim & Lum | Player |
2021-01-18 - Present | FK Skopje | Player |