Name | Dimitar Ivanov Makriev |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1984-01-07 (40) |
Country | |
Position | Forward |
Height | 188 cm |
Weight | 76 kg |
Preferred foot | Right |
Present | Bulgaria | Player |
2002-07-01 - 2002-12-31 | CSKA Sofia | Player |
2003-07-01 - 2004-06-30 | Gornik Zabrze | On loan |
2005-01-01 - 2005-05-31 | FC Chiasso | On loan |
2005-07-01 - 2007-12-31 | NK Maribor | Player |
2008-01-01 - 2011-06-30 | MS Ashdod | Player |
2011-07-01 - 2011-12-31 | Krylia Sovetov | Player |
2012-01-01 - 2012-06-30 | PFC Oleksandria | Player |
2012-07-01 - 2013-06-30 | MS Ashdod | Player |
2013-08-31 - 2014-06-30 | Levski Sofia | Player |
2015-01-23 - 2015-06-30 | Pecsi MFC | Player |
2015-07-01 - 2018-07-29 | Nea Salamis Famagusta | Player |
2018-07-30 - 2018-12-31 | Arda Kardzhali | Player |
2019-01-01 - 2019-08-30 | Ermis Aradippou | Player |
2019-08-31 - 2020-06-30 | PO Xylotympou 2006 | Player |
2020-12-09 - Present | Vihren Sandanski | Player |