Name | Robert Tasevski |
---|---|
Country |
2013-07-01 - 2015-02-28 | Lokomotiva Skopje | Player |
2015-03-01 - 2015-06-30 | Gorno Lisice | Player |
2016-07-01 - 2016-12-31 | Tikves Kavadarci | Player |
2017-01-01 - 2017-06-30 | Metalurg Skopje | Player |
2018-01-01 - 2018-06-30 | Gorno Lisice | Player |
2018-07-01 - Present | Detonit Plackovica | Player |