Name | Anton Tsirin |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1987-08-10 (37) |
Country | |
Position | Guard |
Height | 198 cm |
Weight | 92 kg |
Preferred foot | Right |
2015-08-31 | Kazakhstan | Player |
2009-03-07 - 2011-12-31 | Irtysh Pavlodar | Player |
2012-01-01 - 2012-12-31 | Akzhayik Uralsk | Player |
2013-01-01 - 2013-12-31 | Zhetysu | Player |
2014-01-01 - 2014-12-31 | FK Atyrau | Player |
2015-01-01 - 2016-12-31 | Irtysh Pavlodar | Player |
2015-01-18 - 2015-12-31 | Okzhetpes Kokshetau | On loan |
2017-01-01 - 2017-06-30 | Kaisar Kyzylorda | Player |
2017-07-01 - 2017-12-31 | Irtysh Pavlodar | Player |
2018-01-01 - 2019-02-20 | FK Kyzylzhar | Player |
2019-02-21 - 2019-07-02 | Irtysh Pavlodar | Player |
2019-07-03 - Present | FK Kyzylzhar | Player |