Name | Shpetim Mocka |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1989-10-20 (34) |
Country | |
Position | Guard |
Height | 191 cm |
Weight | 82 kg |
Preferred foot | Right |
Present | Albania U21 | Player |
2007-07-01 - 2012-06-30 | KS Flamurtari Vlore | Player |
2012-03-01 - 2012-06-30 | Apolonia Fier | On loan |
2012-08-01 - 2013-07-10 | Kastrioti Krujë | Player |
2013-08-30 - 2014-06-30 | KS Flamurtari Vlore | Player |
2014-07-01 - 2015-01-29 | Mamurras | Player |
2015-01-30 - 2016-08-30 | Laci | Player |
2015-08-29 - 2018-08-13 | Teuta Durres | On loan |
2016-08-30 - Present | Teuta Durres | Player |
2018-08-14 - 2019-01-28 | KF Tirana | Player |
2019-01-29 - 2019-08-17 | Bylis Ballsh | Player |
2019-08-22 - 2024-07-23 | KS Flamurtari Vlore | Player |