Name | William Bosisto |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1993-09-08 (31) |
Country |
2016-07-01 - Present | Cricket Australia XI | Player |
2017-01-01 - Present | Western Australia | Player |
2017-07-01 - 2023-11-26 | Perth Scorchers | Player |
2019-12-01 - 2022-09-30 | South Australia | Player |