Name | Onur Cakir |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1986-01-27 (38) |
Country | |
Position | Defender |
2008-07-01 - 2009-07-31 | Ankaragucu | Player |
2009-08-01 - 2010-08-13 | Hatayspor | Player |
2015-08-14 - 2016-07-31 | Cizrespor | Player |
2016-01-08 - 2017-01-30 | Iskenderun FK | Player |
2017-07-07 - 2018-01-07 | Ofspor | Player |
2018-01-08 - 2019-09-18 | Payas Belediyespor 1975 | Player |