Name | Shaun Michael De Los Santos |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1998-01-26 (26) |
Country | |
Position | Midfielder |
Preferred foot | Right |
2014-09-21 - 2014-09-28 | Gibraltar U17 | Player |
2015-10-06 - 2018-01-17 | Gibraltar U19 | Player |
2017-06-07 - Present | Gibraltar U21 | Player |
2018-07-01 - 2018-12-31 | Gibraltar United | Player |
2019-07-26 - 2021-02-09 | Manchester 62 FC | Player |