Name | Migert Taulla |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1996-01-10 (28) |
Country | |
Position | Forward |
2014-07-01 - 2015-06-30 | Partizani Tirana | Player |
2016-09-20 - 2016-12-31 | Besa Kavaje | Player |
2017-01-01 - 2019-06-30 | KS Turbina Cerrik | Player |
2019-07-01 - Present | KF Iliria Fushe-Kruje | Player |