Name | Ilya Viznovich |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1998-02-10 (26) |
Country | |
Position | Forward |
Height | 185 cm |
Weight | 75 kg |
Preferred foot | Right |
Present | Russia U21 | Player |
2014-07-01 - 2015-06-30 | FK Lada Tolyatti | Player |
2015-07-01 - 2019-06-30 | Krylia Sovetov | Player |
2015-07-01 - 2019-06-30 | Krylia Sovetov II | Player |
2015-07-01 - 2016-06-30 | Krylia Sovetov U19 | Player |
2018-07-20 - 2019-06-30 | Luch-Energiya Vladivostok | On loan |
2019-07-01 - 2021-02-10 | Shinnik Yaroslavl | Player |
2020-01-24 - 2020-06-30 | Tom Tomsk | On loan |
2020-01-24 - 2021-02-09 | Tom Tomsk | On loan |
2021-02-11 - 2021-06-30 | FC Irtysh Omsk | On loan |
2021-07-08 - 2022-01-09 | Metallurg Lipetsk | Player |
2022-07-01 - 2023-08-05 | Sokol Saratov | Player |
2023-08-06 - Present | Maxline Rogachev | Player |