Name | Martin Sandov |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1995-07-31 (29) |
Country | |
Position | Midfielder |
2015-07-01 - 2016-06-30 | Lokomotiv Gorna Oryahovitsa | Player |
2016-07-01 - 2016-12-31 | Botev Vratsa | Player |
2017-01-01 - 2018-06-30 | Oborishte | Player |
2018-07-01 - 2019-12-31 | Lokomotiv Gorna Oryahovitsa | Player |
2020-01-31 - 2021-06-30 | FC Lovech | Player |
2021-07-01 - 2022-06-30 | Sportist Svoge | Player |
2022-07-01 - Present | Montana | Player |