Name | Daulet Zainetdinov |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1997-05-15 (27) |
Country | |
Position | Midfielder |
2015-07-01 - 2015-12-31 | FC Astana U19 | Player |
2016-07-01 - 2016-12-31 | FC Astana | Player |
2018-01-01 - 2018-12-31 | Zhetysu II | Player |
2021-04-01 - 2021-12-31 | FK Aksu | Player |
2022-01-01 - 2024-03-20 | Khan Tengri FC | Player |
2024-03-21 - Present | FK Kaspyi Aktau | Player |