Name | Meiirlan Kaiyrmagambetov |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1997-10-22 (26) |
Country | |
Position | Guard |
2015-07-01 - 2018-01-30 | Aktobe | Player |
2018-01-01 - 2018-06-30 | FK Aktobe | Player |
2018-01-31 - 2018-12-31 | Aktobe Zhas | Player |
2019-01-01 - Present | Aktobe Zhas | Player |