Name | Ricardo Pacheco |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1986-11-15 (37) |
Country |
2016-01-21 | G2 Esports | Player |
2016-01-21 - 2016-08-17 | FaZe | Player |
2017-05-16 - 2018-01-15 | Dignitas | Player |
2018-01-15 - 2018-10-03 | devils.one | Player |
2018-10-03 - 2021-03-18 | Giants Gaming | Player |
2021-03-18 - 2022-03-02 | OFFSET | Player |
2022-03-02 - 2022-09-21 | Fourteen | Player |
2022-03-02 - 2022-09-21 | Fourteen | Player |
2022-09-21 - 2023-07-05 | 00Nation | Player |
2023-07-05 - Present | SAW | Player |
2023-07-05 - Present | SAW | Player |