Name | Thomas Yuen |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1997-02-18 (27) |
Country |
2016-01-08 - 2016-07-11 | Dignitas | Player |
2018-03-22 - 2018-05-31 | Millenium | Player |
2018-07-01 - 2018-08-30 | Dark Passage | Player |
2018-12-09 - 2019-05-06 | Fenerbahce | Player |
2019-05-08 - 2020-01-19 | Misfits Academy | Player |
2019-06-13 - 2019-12-31 | Misfits Gaming | Player |
2020-08-20 - 2020-12-31 | Misfits Academy | Player |
2021-01-01 - 2021-05-19 | Team GO | Player |
2021-05-20 - 2021-11-30 | Schalke 04 Esports | Player |
2021-12-01 - 2022-04-03 | NASR | Player |
2022-05-01 - Present | Mirage Elyandra | Player |