Name | Viktor Dyankov |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1994-07-28 (30) |
Country |
2016-05-07 - 2016-05-12 | Mortal Kombat | Player |
2016-05-12 - 2016-07-12 | Team Orbit | Player |
2016-05-12 - 2016-08-26 | FLUFFY AIMERS | Player |
2016-10-12 - 2017-04-03 | Rogue | Player |
2017-06-12 - 2017-09-03 | Imperial | Player |
2017-12-12 - 2019-09-10 | Windigo | Player |
2019-09-11 - 2019-09-21 | FATE | Player |
2019-09-11 - 2021-03-05 | FATE | Player |
2019-09-22 - 2021-03-05 | Phoenix | Player |
2021-03-05 - 2021-03-29 | VOYVODA | Player |
2021-03-29 - 2022-06-26 | Team Fiend | Player |
2022-06-26 - 2022-08-06 | k1ck | Player |