Name | Anton Memcevic |
---|---|
Date of birth | 1998-08-23 (26) |
Country | |
Position | Midfielder |
2016-01-01 - 2016-06-30 | FK Iskra Danilovgrad | Player |
2018-02-14 - 2019-06-30 | FK Decic Tuzi | Player |
2019-08-01 - 2021-06-30 | FK Jedinstvo Bijelo Polje | Player |
2021-07-02 - 2022-02-10 | FK Kom Podgorica | Player |
2022-02-11 - Present | FK Cetinje | Player |